Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s8913a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 9755a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.354 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.354 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to economic development |