Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9783b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 9783a | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | referred to housing |