Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.143 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.828 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9054 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.479 | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | reported |