Assembly | 11/11/2024 | signed chap.449 | ||
Assembly | 11/08/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1893 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9258 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.440 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | referred to veterans' affairs |