Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted by s9077a | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.203 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.203 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | print number 9865a | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | referred to ways and means |