Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.492 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1669 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9550 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.82 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules |