Assembly | 08/29/2024 | signed chap.292 | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1019 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7731A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.356 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.356 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | amend and recommit to rules 9888c | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | print number 9888b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 9888a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2024 | referred to governmental operations |