Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.507 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.507 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9890b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | print number 9890a | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |