Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.87 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1719 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8960 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.278 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.278 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2024 | referred to governmental employees |