Assembly | 09/20/2024 | signed chap.323 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1233 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9202 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.83 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.83 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2024 | referred to real property taxation |