Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.494 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1520 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8997 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.281 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.281 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2024 | referred to governmental employees |