Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.253 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1426 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9128 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.207 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | referred to governmental operations |