Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted by s7861a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.361 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | print number 10051a | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | referred to real property taxation |