Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s9450a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.512 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | print number 10103b | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | amend and recommit to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | print number 10103a | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | referred to science and technology |