Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.256 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1461 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9249 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.123 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.123 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules |