Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted by s9076 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.364 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.364 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | referred to governmental employees |