Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.112 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.638 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3185A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.416 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.416 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | referred to environmental conservation |