Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.637 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1900 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9519A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.514 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.514 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | print number 10189b | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | amend and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 10189a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | referred to health |