Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.568 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1533 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9424 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.84 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.84 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | referred to children and families |