Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.148 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1341 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9453 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.127 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 10214a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | referred to housing |