Senate | 06/07/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1734 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9723 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.368 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.368 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | referred to ways and means |