Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s8139a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.581 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | print number 10324a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | referred to governmental operations |