Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.47 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1262 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9421 | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.220 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.220 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules |