Assembly | 08/06/2024 | signed chap.216 | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1540 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9687 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.225 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.225 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | referred to election law |