Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.370 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1786 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9327B | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.516 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.516 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2024 | print number 10362b | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | print number 10362a | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | amend and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to insurance |