Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted by s9241 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.382 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |