Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s9772 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.659 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | print number 10516a | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to governmental employees |