New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00177 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/20/2022

 
 Senate Resolution No. 177 BY: Senator TEDISCO COMMENDING John E. Hughes posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate WHEREAS, Members of the Armed Services from the State of New York, who have served so valiantly and honorably in wars in which this country's freedom was at stake, as well as in the preservation of peace in peacetime, deserve a special salute from this Legislative Body; and WHEREAS, This Legislative Body is justly proud to commend John E. Hughes posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate, to be celebrated at the Saratoga County Honor Our Deceased Veterans Ceremony on Tuesday, December 20, 2022; and WHEREAS, The New York State Senate Liberty Medal was established by Resolution and is awarded to individuals who have merited special commendation for exceptional, heroic, or humanitarian acts on behalf of their fellow New Yorkers; and WHEREAS, Born on April 4, 1945 in Corinth, New York to William and Doris Hughes, John E. Hughes attended Hadley-Luzerne schools where he was active in sports and band, graduating in 1964; and WHEREAS, John E. Hughes entered the United States Army on June 13, 1966; he proudly served with Company C, 124th Signal Battalion, 4th Infantry Division and spent 13 months in Vietnam as a Radio Teletype Operator; and WHEREAS, While stationed in the Central Highlands, John E. Hughes assisted with transporting soldiers and supplies to and from firebases from his main camp; he also participated in Reaction Force Patrols which led to his designation as recipient of the Army Commendation Medal for Heroism while saving a fellow soldiers life against a hostile force in the Republic of Vietnam; and WHEREAS, In addition to this most auspicious recognition, John E. Hughes was also awarded the National Defense Service Medal, Vietnam Service Medal, Vietnam Campaign Medal, Army Commendation Medal with "V" Device, 2 Over-Sea Bars, and the Army Sharp Shooter with Rifle clasp for his courageous service during the Vietnam War; and WHEREAS, John E. Hughes was honorably discharged at the rank of Sergeant on June 13, 1966; upon the completion of his valiant military service, John was employed through Finch Prime & Co. for nearly 30 years as a heavy equipment operator, retiring in the mid 90s; and WHEREAS, With a steadfast and unwavering commitment to his community, John E. Hughes served as Assessor for the Town of Hadley for 16 years, and was an active member of the William J. Varney American Legion Post No. 862, VFW Post No. 5836, the Vietnam Veterans of America, and the Tri-Town Seniors; and WHEREAS, Furthermore, John E. Hughes was passionate about sports, and spent many years in HLSD Little League as a Coach, Purchasing Agent and President; he also loved to travel, the outdoors and nature; and WHEREAS, John E. Hughes married the love of his life on April 4, 1970, and together they raised their three wonderful children; he died on February 15, 2017, at the age of 71; and WHEREAS, Residents of this great State must never forget the courage with which these men and women served their country, and must recognize that no greater debt is owed than that owed to those who have risked their lives for their beloved Nation; and WHEREAS, Having exhibited his patriotism both at home and abroad, John E. Hughes demonstrated his love for his country and merits forevermore the highest respect of his State and Nation; and WHEREAS, Our Nation's veterans deserve to be recognized, commended and thanked by the people of the State of New York for their service and for their dedication to their communities, their State and their Nation; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That this Legislative Body pause in its deliberations to commend John E. Hughes posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution, suitably engrossed, be transmitted to the family of John E. Hughes.