New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00618 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/24/2023

 
 Senate Resolution No. 618 BY: Senator HINCHEY COMMENDING Charles R. Vogel posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate WHEREAS, Members of the Armed Services from the State of New York, who have served so valiantly and honorably in wars in which this country's freedom was at stake, as well as in the preservation of peace in peace-time, deserve a special salute from this Legislative Body; and WHEREAS, This Legislative Body is justly proud to commend Charles R. Vogel posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate, to be presented at the Columbia County Honor a Veteran Ceremony on Monday, April 24, 2023; and WHEREAS, The New York State Senate Liberty Medal was established by Resolution and is awarded to individuals who have merited special commendation for exceptional, heroic, or humanitarian acts on behalf of their fellow New Yorkers; and WHEREAS, Charles Richard Vogel, affectionately known to many as Rip, was born on July 9, 1926, to Charles F. and Lillian (Stinton) Vogel in Albany, New York; he grew up in nearby Chatham, New York, where he attended high school before leaving to enlist in the United States Navy in July of 1943; and WHEREAS, Charles R. Vogel completed basic training at the naval training center located in Great Lakes, Illinois; he was then stationed at both Corpus Christi, Texas, and San Bruno, California, before he served with the Seabees in the Pacific Theater of Operation during World War II; and WHEREAS, Seaman First Class Charles R. Vogel was assigned to the USNATS Squadron 14-B his unit constructed airstrips on the islands of Leyte and Samar, Philippines, where, due to the harsh tropical conditions, he received treatment for a serious skin condition that required hospitalization and resulted in a service-related disability; and WHEREAS, Upon his discharge on April 23, 1946, Seaman First Class Charles R. Vogel was awarded the American Campaign Medal, Asiatic-Pacific Campaign Medal, WWII Victory Medal and the Philippines Liberation Ribbon for his courageous service; and WHEREAS, Charles R. Vogel returned to his hometown and graduated from high school in 1947; in this same year, he married the former Elaine Keating and together, they raised their three children, Gary, Gail and Gay in Stottville, New York; and WHEREAS, For 40 years, Charles R. Vogel worked as a telephone lineman and office planner for Taconic Telephone Co.; and WHEREAS, Aside from his work and family, Charles R. Vogel was active in local sports and his community; he played on an American Legion Baseball team, managed a softball team from Chatham and Philmont, and in 1979, he was inducted into the Columbia Basketball County Hall of Fame; and WHEREAS, Charles R. Vogel was also a member of the Chatham American Legion Post 42, Chatham Fire Department and a life member of the Saint Luke's Episcopal Church of Chatham; and WHEREAS, Above all, Charles R. Vogel enjoyed spending time with his family, especially his eight grandchildren and 11 great-grandchildren; and WHEREAS, Charles R. Vogel died on September 26, 2000, at the age of 74, and is interred in the Chatham Rural Cemetery; and WHEREAS, Residents of this great State must never forget the courage with which these men and women served their country, and must recognize that no greater debt is owed than that owed to those who gave their lives for their beloved Nation and to those who continue to be missing in action; and WHEREAS, Having exhibited his patriotism both at home and abroad, Charles R. Vogel demonstrated his love for his country and merits forevermore the highest respect of his State and Nation; and WHEREAS, Our Nation's veterans deserve to be recognized, commended and thanked by the people of the State of New York for their service and for their dedication to their communities, their State and their Nation; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That this Legislative Body pause in its deliberations to commend Charles R. Vogel posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution, suitably engrossed, be transmitted to the family of Charles R. Vogel.