New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00752 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/29/1920

 
 Senate Resolution No. 752 BY: Senator TEDISCO COMMENDING Robert R. Sherman posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate WHEREAS, Members of the Armed Services from the State of New York, who have served so valiantly and honorably in wars in which this country's freedom was at stake, as well as in the preservation of peace in peacetime, deserve a special salute from this Legislative Body; and WHEREAS, This Legislative Body is justly proud to commend Robert R. Sherman posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate, to be presented at the Saratoga County Honor a Deceased Veteran Ceremony; and WHEREAS, The New York State Senate Liberty Medal was established by Resolution and is awarded to individuals who have merited special commendation for exceptional, heroic, or humanitarian acts on behalf of their fellow New Yorkers; and WHEREAS, Robert R. Sherman was born on December 29, 1920, in Galway, New York, where he drove a truck for the town before entering the United States Air Force on September 8, 1942; after attending Aircraft Mechanic School and Aerial Gunnery and Fire Control School at Westover Air Force Base, he was shipped to Europe where he proudly served his country with the 564th Bomber Squadron, 389th Bomb Group in England during World War II; and WHEREAS, During his deployment, Robert R. Sherman flew 11 missions, and on March 8, 1944, his B-24 Bomber aircraft was hit by enemy fire in a raid on Berlin and his crew crashed in German occupied Holland; fortunately, he and his fellow surviving crewmembers evaded capture, and the Dutch Resistance rescued him and hid him for 13 months until he was freed by the Canadian Army in April of 1945; and WHEREAS, For his courageous service during World War II, Robert R. Sherman was awarded the Air Medal with Oak Leaf Cluster and the European African Middle Eastern Campaign Medal with Bronze Star; and WHEREAS, Upon the completion of his military service on October 31, 1945, Robert R. Sherman returned to his hometown and married his wife Corinne, and together, they raised their daughter Barbara; and WHEREAS, Robert R. Sherman worked as a heavy equipment operator for Lancaster Construction Company before retiring in 1982; in addition to this role, he was the Superintendent of Highways for the Town of Galway and the co-owner of the Dun Dozin Diner in Mayfield, New York; and WHEREAS, Devoted to his fellow veterans, Robert R. Sherman was a member of the American Legion Post 1461 in Galway; and WHEREAS, Robert R. Sherman died on November 21, 1990, at the age of 69; and WHEREAS, Having exhibited his patriotism both at home and abroad, Robert R. Sherman demonstrated his love for his country and merits forevermore the highest respect of his State and Nation; and WHEREAS, Our Nation's veterans deserve to be recognized, commended and thanked by the people of the State of New York for their service and for their dedication to their communities, their State and their Nation; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That this Legislative Body pause in its deliberations to commend Robert R. Sherman posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution, suitably engrossed, be transmitted to the family of Robert R. Sherman.