New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01447 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/07/2023

 
 Senate Resolution No. 1447 BY: Senator PALUMBO CONGRATULATING Manuel Joaquim DaSilva Vilar of Springs, New York, upon the occasion of celebrating his 100th Birthday on October 7, 2023 WHEREAS, It is the custom of this Legislative Body to commemorate and recognize certain milestones celebrated by citizens of this great Empire State; and WHEREAS, Senior citizens bring a wealth of experience and knowledge to the increasingly active roles they play in today's society; their past contributions and future participation are a vital part of, and valuable asset to, the fabric of community life and activity; and WHEREAS, Attendant to such concern, and in full accord with its long-standing traditions, this Legislative Body is justly proud to congratulate Manuel Joaquim DaSilva Vilar upon the occasion of his 100th Birthday, which was celebrated at the American Legion Post 419 in East Hampton, New York, on Saturday, October 7, 2023; and WHEREAS, On October 10, 1923, in Murtosa, a small seaside farming and fishing town in northern Portugal, Manuel Joaquim DaSilva Vilar was born in his maternal family's home which they owned for hundreds of years; the family first migrated from France in the 1100s, settling in Murtosa in the early 1400s; and WHEREAS, The DeVillars are descendants of Hugh Capet, King of the Franks, the first king from the House of Capet; Robert I, Duke of Burgundy; and King Denis I of Portugal; and WHEREAS, During World War II, the Portuguese military drafted Manuel Vilar, commissioning him to serve in Portuguese colonies throughout Africa and Asia; and WHEREAS, After the war, Manuel Vilar immigrated to the United States, joining his father and uncles in the construction trades in New York City; subsequently, he was hired by a construction firm that was associated with the Rockefeller family's Standard Oil Company, traveling throughout Canada and Venezuela; and WHEREAS, Several years later, Manuel Vilar returned to New York's metropolitan area, joining the United Cement Masons and Plasterers Union Local 780; and WHEREAS, In 1956, Manuel Vilar met Amelia Eninger Branco, marrying her on June 9, 1957; the couple were blessed with a son, Manuel Marques Vilar, in 1960; and WHEREAS, The Vilar family purchased property, constructing their home, in Springs, New York, in 1965; this hamlet of East Hampton reminded Manuel Vilar of his childhood home in Murtosa and was where he felt comfortable; and WHEREAS, As the foreman of the cement masons for 30 years, Manuel Vilar supervised hundreds of masons on multiple projects throughout the New York metropolitan area; and WHEREAS, These ventures included New York City World's Fair; Throgs Neck Bridge, Whitestone Bridge, and Verrazano Bridge; the TWA, Pan Am, and United Airlines terminals, as well as miles of runways, at John F. Kennedy International Airport; runways at LaGuardia Airport; highways, including Van Wyck and Long Island Expressways; and numerous buildings throughout Long Island, New York, including the Hunting Quadrangles; and WHEREAS, After retirement in 1986, at the age of 63, Manuel Vilar continued to construct multiple homes with his wife, Amelia, in the Hudson, Florida, area; after September 11, 2001, the couple returned to reside full-time in the home they built in Springs; as fervent gardeners, they tended to an extensive garden with 38 varieties of fruit trees; and WHEREAS, An ardent fisherman, Manuel Vilar owned and enjoyed a boat for 40 years; his passion for fishing earned him the nickname of Fish Commander; and WHEREAS, Manuel Vilar was predeceased by his beloved wife in 2019 after 62 years of marriage; and WHEREAS, With his zest for life, Manuel Vilar has inspired and enriched the lives of his family and friends through the profound charm and wisdom which come only from a fullness of years; this exceptional centenarian has experienced the incredible joys and sorrows characteristic of, and reserved for, those with the stamina and courage to savor a full life; and WHEREAS, More than 150 attendees personally extended their birthday wishes to Manuel Vilar; he was lovingly surrounded by grandchildren, Matthew (Lauren), Brendan (Ciara), Catherine, Manuel, James, and Thomas; great-grandchildren, Brea, Carter, and Beau; cousins; and close friends from the Springs community; and WHEREAS, It is the intent of this Legislative Body to publicly recognize those who have reached such a remarkable age and who have witnessed and celebrated the innovations, cultural developments, and awesome achievements of this country during the last century, while themselves contributing to the growth and excellence of this great Empire State; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That this Legislative Body pause in its deliberations to congratulate Manuel Joaquim DaSilva Vilar upon the occasion of celebrating his 100th Birthday on October 7, 2023; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution, suitably engrossed, be transmitted to Manuel Joaquim DaSilva Vilar.