Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1264 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.530 |