LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S00028
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S00028
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S00028
Action History
Senate
08/25/2023
RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Senate
06/10/2023
COMMITTED TO RULES
Senate
03/20/2023
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
03/16/2023
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
03/15/2023
1ST REPORT CAL.507
Senate
01/04/2023
REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION