Senate | 05/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.574 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |