Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 150A | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.421 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.760 |