Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.310 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a4983d | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 158E | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | referred to science and technology | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 158D | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | AMENDED 158C | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.76 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 158B | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 158A | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.429 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |