Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.287 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |