Senate | 01/22/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2656 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.95 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.183 |