Senate | 12/13/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.35 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.570 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.390 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | substituted for a4957 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.205 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.261 |