Senate | 12/21/2024 | VETOED MEMO.139 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.43 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a1432c | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1881 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 206B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 206A |