Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1371A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 208A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |