Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.422 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.397 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted for a7037a | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 209A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.401 |