Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.537 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 211A | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |