Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3866B | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 220B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1236 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 220A | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 1 |