Senate | 05/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 237C | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 237B | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 237A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |