Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.306 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a3299e | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.903 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 239E | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 239D | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1615 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 239C | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 239B | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 239A |