Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6291A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 264A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | referred to people with disabilities | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.197 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |