Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1191B | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1792 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 288C | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 288B | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 288A | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |