Senate | 02/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.161 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.847 |