Senate | 01/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.83 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 348C | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.151 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 348B | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 348A | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |